Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Julien Rabin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lhassa, China

Priest of La Société des Missions Etrangères

Titular See: (ad interim)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1819Born
21 Dec 184425.7Ordained PriestPriest
1849²29.7AppointedPrefect of Lhassa, China
22 Jan 184929.8ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1852²32.7ResignedPrefect of Lhassa, China
17 Feb 187656.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lhassa, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julien Rabin
Father Julien Rabin M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lhassa

EventPlace
Birth PlacePannecé, Diocese of Nantes, France
Death PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes, France

  • a priest for 31.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast