Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Laurent-Joseph-Marius Imbert, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1796Born
18 Dec 181923.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Apr 183640.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
26 Apr 183640.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
14 May 183741.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
21 Sep 183943.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea
5 Jul 1925Beatified
6 May 1984Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Laurent-Joseph-Marius Imbert (VIAF: 88985581)
Bishop St. Laurent-Joseph-Marius Imbert M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarignane, France

  • a priest for 19.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,837, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast