Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Philibert LeBlanc, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yunnan, China

Titular Bishop of Troas

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1644Born
Oct 1696³51.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yunnan, China
3 Dec 171874.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
2 Sep 172075.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Yunnan, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philibert LeBlanc
Father Philibert LeBlanc M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yunnan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDijon, Diocese of Dijon, France
Death PlaceKoang-tung

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 391
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast