Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Etienne-Marie-Alphonse Sonnois

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1828Born
3 Oct 185223.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 188961.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
30 Dec 188961.0ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
19 Mar 189061.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
9 Apr 189061.3InstalledBishop of Saint-Dié, France
26 Nov 189263.9SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
19 Jan 189364.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
7 Feb 191384.1DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Marie-Alphonse Sonnois (VIAF: 193811197)
Archbishop Etienne-Marie-Alphonse Sonnois (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLamargelle, Diocese of Dijon
Ordained BishopAuxonne

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 176, and Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017