Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Frérot

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1830Born
23 Sep 185424.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Apr 189261.7SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
11 Jul 189261.9ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
24 Aug 189262.1Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
8 Sep 189262.1InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
6 Sep 189969.1DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Frérot (VIAF: 59182475)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Frérot (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuncey-Sur-Seine
Ordained BishopS. Michel, Dijon, Diocese of Dijon

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017