Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Auriol, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1321AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
14 Jun 1321Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
10 Jan 1322DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Auriol
Archbishop Pierre Auriol O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 6 May 2019

Quantcast