Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siméon-Étienne de Popian

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Sep 1601AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
9 Dec 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
29 Mar 1627DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Siméon-Étienne de Popian:
Bishop Siméon-Étienne de Popian (died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • ob/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015