Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Dominique de Cheylus

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1717¹BornAvignon
15 Nov 176144.8SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
29 Mar 176245.2ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
25 Apr 176245.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
2 Nov 176649.8SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
17 Dec 176649.9ResignedBishop of Tréguier, France
22 Dec 176649.9ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
17 Nov 177659.8SelectedBishop of Bayeux, France
14 Dec 177659.9ResignedBishop of Cahors, France
17 Feb 177760.1ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux, France
22 Feb 179780.1DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Dominique de Cheylus:
Bishop Joseph-Dominique de Cheylus (born 1717, died ) Bishop of Bayeux

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 157
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 414
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015