Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Charles-Vincent-Gaspar-Constantin-Antoine Giovio

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1729BornPérouse
20 Aug 177546.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Sep 177546.4AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
8 Oct 177546.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
6 Nov 177647.5InstalledArchbishop of Avignon, France
11 Oct 179364.5DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles-Vincent-Gaspar-Constantin-Antoine Giovio:
Archbishop Jean-Charles-Vincent-Gaspar-Constantin-Antoine Giovio (born , died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015