Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Poncet

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606BornParis
3 Aug 166761.6AppointedBishop of Sisteron, France
17 Jun 167569.5AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
21 Feb 167771.1DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Poncet:
Archbishop Michel Poncet (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 121, and Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013