Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Boissonnade d’Orty

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornAgen
27 Jul 166745.5SelectedBishop of Bazas, France
30 Jan 166846.0ConfirmedBishop of Bazas, France
29 Apr 166846.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
22 Sep 168462.7DiedBishop of Bazas, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Boissonnade d’Orty:
Bishop Guillaume de Boissonnade d’Orty (died ) Bishop of Bazas

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 405
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015