Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armand de Béthune

Deceased

Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1635BornParis
19 Aug 166126.0SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
22 Apr 166529.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
12 Jul 166529.9Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
10 Dec 170368.3DiedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France

MicroData Summary for Armand de Béthune:
Bishop Armand de Béthune (born , died ) Bishop of Le Puy-en-Velay

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015