Catholic-Hierarchy DC

César Cardinal d’Estrées

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laon

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1628BornParis
Feb 165325.0SelectedBishop of Laon, France
30 Aug 165527.6ConfirmedBishop of Laon, France
26 Sep 165527.6Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
24 Aug 167143.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 May 167244.3Elevated to Cardinal
8 Aug 167244.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
28 Jan 167547.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
2 Jun 168153.3ResignedBishop of Laon, France
15 Sep 169870.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
18 Dec 171486.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for César d’Estrées:
César Cardinal d’Estrées (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laon

  • a bishop for 59.2 years
  • a cardinal for 43.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Aug 1671
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014