Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Rechiègne Voisin de Guron

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1617²BornAnjou
2 Aug 165234.7SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
26 May 165335.5ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
1 Nov 165336.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
16 Jan 167153.2SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
167254.1ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
20 Dec 167760.1ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
20 May 169375.5DiedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Rechiègne Voisin de Guron:
Bishop Louis de Rechiègne Voisin de Guron (died ) Bishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges

  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015