Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-François d’Anglure de Bourlémont

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1605BornBourlémont
10 Jan 165044.6ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
25 Mar 165044.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
20 Jun 165752.1SelectedBishop of Castres, France
17 Feb 165953.7ConfirmedBishop of Castres, France
1 Jul 166257.1SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
15 Sep 166459.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
25 Nov 166964.5DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-François d’Anglure de Bourlémont:
Archbishop Charles-François d’Anglure de Bourlémont (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69, and Page 140
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015