Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Le Boux

Deceased

Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1621Born
31 Oct 165837.3SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
26 May 165937.9ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
4 Apr 166038.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
1 May 166644.8SelectedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
15 Dec 166645.4ConfirmedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France
4 Aug 169372.0DiedBishop of Périgueux (Vesuna), France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Le Boux
Bishop Guillaume Le Boux (born , died ) Bishop of Périgueux (Vesuna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouzay

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89, and Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,660, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast