Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Léonard de Trapes, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Nov 1599AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
25 Jan 1600Ordained BishopArchbishop of Auch, France
29 Oct 1629DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Léonard de Trapes
Archbishop Léonard de Trapes O.F.M. Cap. (died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNevers

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 126
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017