Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnauld de Pontac

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
19 Nov 157242.8AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
23 Nov 157242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
4 Feb 160575.0DiedBishop of Bazas, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnauld de Pontac (VIAF: 64044867)
Bishop Arnauld de Pontac (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Bazas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Ordained BishopSaint Louis des Français, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceS. Pardoux de Conquers

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 359
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018