Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léger de Plas, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1549¹Born
19 Jul 159950.5AppointedBishop of Lectoure, France
19 Dec 159950.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
24 Mar 163586.2DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léger de Plas
Bishop Léger de Plas O.S.B. (born 1549, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuremonte, Correze
Ordained BishopS. Germain des Pres, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceCuremonte

  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018