Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardin Corneillan

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹Born
3 Aug 160528.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Rodez, France
3 Aug 160528.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
1 Jan 160629.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
13 Sep 161437.6SucceededBishop of Rodez, France
8 Sep 164568.6DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardin Corneillan
Bishop Bernardin Corneillan (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Rodez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrlhonac de la Rouquette

  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018