Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Léon Cardinal Potier de Gesvres

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1656BornParis
29 May 169437.7SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
30 Aug 169438.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
23 Jan 169538.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
29 Nov 171963.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 172972.5ResignedArchbishop of Bourges, France
12 Nov 174488.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bourges, France

MicroData Summary for Léon Potier de Gesvres:
Léon Cardinal Potier de Gesvres (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bourges

  • a bishop for 49.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015