Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Potier de Novion

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647²BornParis
22 Nov 167528.8SelectedBishop of Sisteron, France
8 Feb 167730.1ConfirmedBishop of Sisteron, France
28 Oct 167730.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sisteron, France
2 May 168134.3SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
16 Feb 168235.1ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
16 May 168235.3InstalledBishop of Evreux, France
14 Oct 170962.7DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Potier de Novion:
Bishop Jacques Potier de Novion (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 31.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 191, and Page 359
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 71
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015