Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond de Montaigne

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornBordeaux
30 Nov 162950.9SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
4 Mar 163051.1ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
14 Jul 163051.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
10 Mar 163758.1DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymond de Montaigne:
Bishop Raymond de Montaigne (died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 5 Mar 2015