Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Noailles

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1589Born
28 Sep 160920.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
8 Apr 164757.6AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
27 Mar 164858.6DiedBishop of Rodez, France

MicroData Summary for Charles de Noailles
Bishop Charles de Noailles (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCros de Montvert

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189, and Page 299
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018