Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alphonse-Louis Cardinal du Plessis de Richelieu, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹Born
1602²20.0EnteredMember of Carthusian Order
12 Mar 160321.1ProfessedMember of Carthusian Order
6 Dec 162543.9SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
27 Apr 162644.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
21 Jun 162644.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
Sep 162846.6SelectedArchbishop of Lyon, France
27 Nov 162846.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Lyon, France
19 Nov 162947.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jun 163553.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
23 Mar 165371.2DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse-Louis du Plessis de Richelieu
Alphonse-Louis Cardinal du Plessis de Richelieu O. Cart. (born 1582, died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
  • a cardinal for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 1629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 15
  • qcar: CB, 30 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 31 May 2018

Quantcast