Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume d’Hugues, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564¹BornPoujol
3 Sep 161248.6AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
16 Sep 161248.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
27 Oct 1648³84.8DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Hugues:
Archbishop Guillaume d’Hugues O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Archbishop of Embrun

  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015