Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Loménie, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹Born
13 May 162439.3AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
8 Sep 162439.6Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
27 Feb 163954.1DiedBishop of Marseille, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Loménie
Bishop François de Loménie O.P. (born 1585, died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoges, Diocese of Limoges

  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast