Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert de Choiseul du Plessis Praslin

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹BornParis
30 May 164431.4SelectedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
6 Feb 164633.0ConfirmedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
8 Apr 164633.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
23 Jul 166956.5SelectedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
22 Dec 167057.9ConfirmedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
31 Dec 168976.9DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert de Choiseul du Plessis Praslin:
Bishop Gilbert de Choiseul du Plessis Praslin (died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015