Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Gassion

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1616BornPau
20 Jul 164731.2SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
13 Jan 164831.7ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
8 Mar 164831.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
24 Apr 165236.0DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Gassion:
Bishop Pierre de Gassion (born , died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 264
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015