Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nivelle, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lušon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹BornTroyes
30 Nov 163542.9SelectedBishop of Lušon, France
22 Sep 163643.7ConfirmedBishop of Lušon, France
25 Jan 163744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lušon, France
11 Feb 166168.1DiedBishop of Lušon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nivelle:
Bishop Pierre Nivelle O. Cist. (born 1593, died ) Bishop of Lušon

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1637, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015