Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marion

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jun 1662AppointedBishop of Gap, France
8 Oct 1662Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
25 Aug 1675DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marion:
Bishop Pierre Marion (died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015