Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Meaupéou

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹Born
21 Apr 165936.3AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
9 May 166037.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
2 May 167754.3DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Meaupéou
Bishop Jean de Meaupéou (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast