Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Albert Belin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornBesançon
7 Dec 166550.9AppointedBishop of Belley, France
14 Feb 166651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
29 Apr 167762.3DiedBishop of Belley, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Albert Belin:
Bishop Jean-Albert Belin O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Belley

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015