Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Colbert

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornReims
8 Feb 166131.1SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
30 May 166131.4ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
24 Jul 166131.5Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
12 Jul 167141.5SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
16 Nov 167141.8ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
5 Sep 167646.6DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Colbert:
Bishop Nicolas de Colbert (died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015