Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Séguier de La Verrière

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornParis
27 Feb 166256.1AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
6 Aug 166256.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lombez, France
5 Jan 167165.0SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
24 Aug 167165.6ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
8 Nov 168983.8DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Séguier de La Verrière:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Séguier de La Verrière (died ) Bishop of Nîmes

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 284
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015