Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Arenthon d’Alex

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1620BornAlex
4 Jul 166140.7AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
9 Oct 166141.0Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
4 Jul 169574.7DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Arenthon d’Alex:
Bishop Jean d’Arenthon d’Alex (born , died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 1 Apr 2015