Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornVinovo
5 May 166051.3AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
9 May 166051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
20 Jan 166253.0DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo della Rovere:
Bishop Girolamo della Rovere (died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 31 Mar 2015