Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Abelly

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rodez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1604³BornParis
9 Jul 166460.1AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
24 Aug 166460.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
1666²61.6ResignedBishop of Rodez, France
4 Oct 169187.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Rodez, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Abelly:
Bishop Louis Abelly (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rodez

  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013