Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles François de La Vieuxville

Deceased

Bishop of Rennes


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1659SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
16 Feb 1660ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
4 Apr 1661Ordained BishopBishop of Rennes, France
29 Jan 1676DiedBishop of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Charles François de La Vieuxville:
Bishop Charles François de La Vieuxville (died ) Bishop of Rennes

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015