Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Forcoal

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹Born
21 Sep 165433.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 167049.8SelectedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
16 May 167251.3ConfirmedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Aug 167251.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
22 Mar 167352.2InstalledBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
27 Feb 168261.1DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Forcoal
Bishop Jean de Forcoal (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 338
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018