Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis de Bretel

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1584BornRouen
6 Oct 163147.4AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
11 Jan 163247.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
27 Mar 164459.9DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Bretel:
Archbishop Louis de Bretel (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Mar 2015