Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Aléaume

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹BornParis
18 May 161529.3AppointedBishop of Riez, France
15 Nov 161529.8Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
1622²36.0ResignedBishop of Riez, France
14 Mar 162236.2AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
29 Aug 163448.6DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Aléaume:
Bishop Guillaume Aléaume (died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 7 Mar 2015