Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume du Vair

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1556BornParis
26 Oct 161761.6AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
1618²61.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
3 Aug 162165.4DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume du Vair:
Bishop Guillaume du Vair (born , died ) Bishop of Lisieux

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015