Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Haqueville

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572¹Born
22 Apr 161947.3SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
12 Aug 161947.6ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
13 Oct 161947.7Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
27 Feb 162351.1DiedBishop of Soissons, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Haqueville
Bishop Charles de Haqueville (born 1572, died ) Bishop of Soissons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOns

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 324
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,205
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1619, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018