Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scipion de Villeneuve-Thorenc

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
20 Dec 163232.9AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
8 May 163333.3Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
3 May 163636.3DiedBishop of Grasse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipion de Villeneuve-Thorenc
Bishop Scipion de Villeneuve-Thorenc (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Grasse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Paul-du-Var

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 196
  • ob: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast