Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Modeste de Villeneuve des Arcs, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Apt, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1600Born
20 Aug 162928.8AppointedBishop of Apt, France
25 Nov 162929.1Ordained BishopBishop of Apt, France
7 Jan 167069.2DiedBishop of Apt, France

MicroData Summary for Modeste de Villeneuve des Arcs
Bishop Modeste de Villeneuve des Arcs O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Apt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast