Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis du Chaine

Deceased

Bishop of Senez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1589Born
2 Apr 161828.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Senez, France
2 Apr 161828.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
17 Jun 161828.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
21 Feb 162333.6SucceededBishop of Senez, France
11 Mar 167181.6DiedBishop of Senez, France

MicroData Summary for Louis du Chaine
Bishop Louis du Chaine (born , died ) Bishop of Senez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix

  • a bishop for 52.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91, and Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018