Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Camelin

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1579BornFréjus
21 Jun 162141.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Fréjus, France
21 Jun 162141.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
5 Dec 162142.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
15 Jun 163757.5SucceededBishop of Fréjus, France
4 Feb 165474.2DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Camelin:
Bishop Pierre Camelin (born , died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 18 Feb 2015