Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octave Isnard

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹Born
12 Jan 160530.0AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
27 Feb 160530.1Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
11 Nov 162550.8DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Octave Isnard
Bishop Octave Isnard (born 1575, died ) Bishop of Glandèves

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice
Ordained BishopSan Luigi de' Francesi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 44
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195
  • ob/c2: AT, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017