Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel de La Mothe-Houdancourt

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
18 Nov 162328.8SelectedBishop of Mende, France
9 Oct 162429.7ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
2 Feb 162530.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
5 Mar 162833.1DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel de La Mothe-Houdancourt
Bishop Daniel de La Mothe-Houdancourt (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoudancourt

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 242
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,625, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast